IL HB5477 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that, as part of its annual renewal application, an animal shelter or animal control facility must report to the Department of Agriculture specific information concerning dogs and cats received from another state or country and specific information concerning disposition and manner of transfer of all dogs and cats that leave its facilities. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMAL SHELTER-TRANSFER REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |