IL HB5475 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Increases the penalty for unlawful use of weapons by selling, manufacturing, purchasing, possessing, or carrying a machine gun, other than in the passenger compartment of a motor vehicle or on one's person if the weapon is loaded, from a Class 2 felony, with a mandatory sentence of not less than 3 years and not more than 7 years imprisonment to a Class 1 felony, with a mandatory sentence of not less than 4 years and not more than 15 years imprisonment. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person serving a sentence for this violation shall receive no more than 7.5 days sentence credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment (rather than day for day sentence credit).
Title
MACHINE GUN-PENALTIES
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-02-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5475&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5475.htm |