IL HB5473 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning if an individual or group policy of accident or health insurance coverage for telehealth services, provides that all health care provider access information of provider directories shall include: whether the provider offers the use of telehealth or telemedicine to deliver services; what modalities the provider uses and what services through telehealth or telemedicine are provided; and whether the provider has the ability and willingness to include in a telehealth or telemedicine encounter a family caregiver who is in a separate location than the patient, if the patient wishes and provides consent. Amends the Telehealth Act. Provides that an insurance company or health plan that provides health care professional or provider directories shall include: whether the provider offers the use of telehealth to deliver services; what modalities the provider uses and what services through telehealth or telemedicine are provided; and whether the provider has the ability and willingness to include in a telehealth encounter a family caregiver who is in a separate location than the patient, if the patient wishes and provides consent. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INSURANCE-TELEHEALTH DIRECTORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.22Amended CodeCitation Text
22515020New CodeSee Bill Text
2251505Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback