IL HB5470 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Collective Bargaining Freedom and Consistent Wage Act. Provides that the authority to enact any ordinance, rule, or regulation, or in any way prohibit, restrict, or regulate the use of union security agreements between an employer and labor organization authorized under federal law vests exclusively with the General Assembly. Limits home rule powers. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts from public inspection certain information collected by the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission and the Department of Insurance. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 regarding workers' compensation fraud penalties. Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Makes changes concerning: when an accidental injury shall not be considered to be "arising out of and in the course of employment" if the accidental injury or medical condition occurred while the claimant was traveling away from the employer's premises; the maximum compensation rate for a period of temporary total incapacity; compensation awards for injuries to the shoulder and hip; annual reports on the state of self-insurance for workers' compensation in Illinois; and other matters. Amends the Franchise Disclosure Act of 1987. Repeals the substantive provisions of the Act except for provisions concerning findings and purposes, provisions imposing fees, and saving provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR BUSINESS VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseTo Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-10.4New CodeSee Bill Text
81570510Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570511Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570512Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570514Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570515Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570516Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570517Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570518Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570519Repealed CodeCitation Text
8157052Amended CodeCitation Text
81570520Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570522Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570523Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570524Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570525Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570526Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570527Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570528Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570529Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570531Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570532Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570533Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570534Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570535Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570536Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570537Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570538Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570539Repealed CodeCitation Text
8157054Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570541Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570542Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570543Repealed CodeCitation Text
81570544Amended CodeCitation Text
8157055Repealed CodeCitation Text
8157056Repealed CodeCitation Text
8157057Repealed CodeCitation Text
8157058Repealed CodeCitation Text
8157059Repealed CodeCitation Text
8203051Amended CodeCitation Text
82030514Amended CodeCitation Text
82030519Amended CodeCitation Text
82030525.5Amended CodeCitation Text
82030529.2Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058.1bAmended CodeCitation Text
8203058.2Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058.2aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback