IL HB5466 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person may operate an all-terrain vehicle or recreational off-highway vehicle on a roadway with a speed limit of 55 miles per hour or less (rather than 35 miles per hour or less) if the roadway is not State highway, federal highway, or within the boundaries of an incorporated area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NON-HIGHWAY VEH-55 MPH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-001-001
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1426.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback