IL HB5466 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person may operate an all-terrain vehicle or recreational off-highway vehicle on a roadway with a speed limit of 55 miles per hour or less (rather than 35 miles per hour or less) if the roadway is not State highway, federal highway, or within the boundaries of an incorporated area.
Title
NON-HIGHWAY VEH-55 MPH
Sponsors
Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-001-001 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1426.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |