IL HB5454 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Freedom to Work Act. Provides that an employer that elects to enforce a covenant not to compete under the Act must pay to the employee subject to the covenant full compensation, including all benefits, that the employee would have received had his or her employment not been discontinued for the time specified in the covenant not to compete or until the separated employee is employed full-time at a commensurate rate of pay and benefits in a field of work not subject to the covenant not to compete. Provides that an attempt to enforce a covenant not to compete in a manner that does not comply with the new provisions voids the covenant not to compete. Effective immediately.
Title
FREEDOM TO WORK ENFORCEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5454&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5454.htm |