IL HB5446 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Crash Report Confidentiality Act. Provides that a public body shall not disclose a crash report, unless requested by (1) an individual who is an involved individual or involved party of the incident; (2) a person who possesses written permission from an involved individual; (3) an educational institution performing a study; (4) the insurance company of an involved individual; (5) a reporter; or (6) a news medium. Provides that the Act applies to all requests for a crash report, including a request made under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a law enforcement agency is not liable for actions taken in good faith compliance with the Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall adopt rules to implement the Act, including rules prescribing procedures for a public body to verify that a person requesting a crash report is entitled to disclosure of the crash report. Makes a corresponding change in the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
CRASH REPORT CONFIDENTIALITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5446&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5446.htm |