IL HB5442 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that, for the purposes of the Act, "public body" does not include a Metropolitan Enforcement Group (MEG) Policy Board or drug task force composed or created by any combination of local law enforcement agencies. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits drug-induced homicide when he or she violates delivery of a controlled substance or methamphetamine or a similar law of another jurisdiction, by unlawfully delivering a controlled substance to another, and the injection, inhalation, absorption, or ingestion of any amount of that controlled substance is a contributing cause of the person's death. Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that controlled substances which are lawfully administered in hospitals or institutions licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act shall be reported under (rather than, exempt from) specified reporting provisions under the Act, and the prescription for the controlled substances ordered and the quantity actually administered (rather than, the reporting requirement only applies for more than a 72-hour supply of a discharge medication to be consumed outside of the hospital or institution). Provides that the information required to be transmitted under the prescription monitoring program must be transmitted not later than the end of the business day on which a controlled substance is dispensed, or at such other time as may be required by the Department of Human Services by administrative rule (rather than, at the end of the next business day on which the controlled substance is dispensed).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE-REPORTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTabled
2018-04-12HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5
2018-04-12HouseMotion Do Not Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-04-09HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51201.02Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-3.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720570313Amended CodeCitation Text
720570316Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback