IL HB5440 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that the fees for a youth resident and non-resident archery deer permit shall be the same. Provides that a resident or non-resident youth under age 18 (rather than only resident youth) may apply to the Department of Natural Resources for a Youth Hunting License and Youth Trapping License.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-YOUTH HUNTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 007-000-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-05-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.26Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.1-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback