IL HB5436 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the filing fees for specified petitions shall be $250 (rather than $75).
Title
EPA-FILING FEES
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2022-04-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-010-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |