IL HB5433 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to calculate the payout ratios reported by managed care organizations no less frequently than annually and to post these calculations on its website. Provides that the minimum payout ratio shall be 85% and that a managed care organization not meeting the 85% threshold must refund to the State, for each coverage year, an amount equal to the difference between the calculated payout ratio and 85% multiplied by coverage year revenue for that managed care organization. Defines "payment ratio". Requires the Department to exclusively use paid claims data submitted by managed care organizations in establishing managed care capitation rates. Provides that managed care organizations shall not be reimbursed by the State for any costs associated with health insurance fees.
Title
MEDICAID-MCO-PAYOUT RATIOS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |