IL HB5432 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county's or municipality's initial report of its audit findings to CATV operators shall include the complete list of all addresses within the corporate limits of the county or municipality. Limits the scope of provisions concerning franchise fees and service provider fee reviews. Provides that contingent fees paid to auditors, including subcontractors, may not exceed 25% of the net amount recovered, inclusive of interest and penalties. Provides that counties and municipalities shall provide to each CATV operator an updated complete list of addresses within the corporate limits of the county or municipality annually. In addition, the county or municipality shall provide a CATV operator the updated address list within 90 days after the date of a written request by the CATV operator and before a CATV operator's franchise fees or service provider fees are derived. Holds harmless the CATV operator for any franchise fee underpayment if the county or municipality does not provide the updated address list. Makes other changes.
Title
COUNTIES/MUNI-CATV FEE AUDITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1095.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-11.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5432&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5432.htm |