IL HB5418 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Foster Children's Bill of Rights Act. Expands the list of rights under the Foster Children's Bill of Rights to include the following: (1) The right to participate in an age and developmentally appropriate intake process immediately after placement in the custody or guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services, during which, the Department shall: (i) provide the youth a document describing inappropriate acts of affection, discipline, and punishment by guardians, foster parents, foster siblings, or any other adult responsible for the youth's welfare; and (ii) review and discuss the document with the child. (2) The right to participate in appropriate intervention and counseling services after removal from the home of origin in order to assess whether the youth is exhibiting signs of traumatic stress, special needs, or mental illness. (3) The right to receive a home visit by an assigned child welfare specialist, per existing Department policies and procedures, on a monthly basis or more frequently as needed. (4) The right to be enrolled in an independent living services program prior to transitioning out of foster care where the youth shall receive classes and instruction, appropriate to the youth's age and developmental capacity, on independent living and self-sufficiency in the areas of employment, finances, meals, and housing as well as help in developing life skills and long-term goals. (5) The right to be assessed by a third-party entity or agency prior to enrollment in any independent living program in order to determine the youth's readiness for a transition out of foster care based on the youth's individual needs, emotional development, and ability, regardless of age, to make a successful transition to adulthood.
Title
FOSTER CHILDREN'S RIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0810 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-001-001 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 521 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |