IL HB5417 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the general purposes of the Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2016-05-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2016-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
2016-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2016-05-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2016-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2016-05-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2016-05-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2016-05-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2016-05-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-03HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
2016-05-03HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2016-05-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2016-04-22HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-04-20HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-04-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 006-001-000
2016-04-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2016-04-14HouseRe-assigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2016-04-13HouseRemains in Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2016-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-04-08HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
2016-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2016-04-04HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2016-04-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-04-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2016-04-01HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2016-02-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2016-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2016-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72051-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback