IL HB5416 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases the penalty for failure to yield the right-of-way to an emergency vehicle or police vehicle making use of audible and visual signals from a business offense with a fine of not less than $100 or more than $10,000 to a Class B misdemeanor and if the offense results in the death of another person it is a Class 4 felony in addition to suspension of the person's license for 2 years.
Title
RIGHT OF WAY/EMERGENCY VEH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed ; -Non-concur |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Dan Brady |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-04-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2014-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-907 | Amended Code | Citation Text |