IL HB5411 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Entrepreneur-in-Residence Act. Creates the Entrepreneur-in-Residence Pilot Program. Provides for the appointment, term of service, and compensation of entrepreneurs-in-residence. Requires the Director or Secretary of specified State agencies to appoint entrepreneurs-in-residence, and issue a report on the Program to the General Assembly and the Governor by January 1, 2025. Provides for the duties of appointed entrepreneurs-in-residence. Provides that an entrepreneur-in-residence shall report directly to his or her appointing authority. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2027. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
ENTREPRENEUR-IN-RES ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5411&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5411.htm |