IL HB5403 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medicaid Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Contains legislative findings concerning the necessity of implementing the Illinois Behavioral Health Transformation Section 1115 demonstration approved May 7, 2018 by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to ensure a truly integrated physical and behavioral health system, centered on Medicaid members, their families, and their communities. Provides that no later than 60 days after the Department of Healthcare and Family Services receives federal approval of any waiver application it submitted to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to effectuate the purposes of the medical assistance program, the Department shall adopt rules to implement the approved waiver. Requires the Department to adopt, within 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, rules to implement the Illinois Behavioral Health Transformation Section 1115 demonstration. Provides that upon expiration of the 60-day rulemaking period, providers of behavioral health services, including providers and facilities that are operated by a county, municipality, township, or unit of local government, shall be eligible for reimbursement from the Department of Human Services for services that are a part of an approved treatment regimen and provided under the Illinois Behavioral Health Transformation Section 1115 demonstration. Provides that eligibility for services provided under the Illinois Behavioral Health Transformation Section 1115 demonstration shall cover up to one year of treatment or until self-sufficiency can be demonstrated. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH WAIVER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5403&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5403.htm |