IL HB5392 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that a person who is a victim of human trafficking, regardless of the relationship between the victim and the trafficker, is protected by both the Code and the Act. Provides that a person who has been the victim of human trafficking, or a person on behalf of a minor child or an adult who has been the victim of human trafficking, may file a petition for an order of protection.
Title
PROTECTIVE ORDER-TRAFFICKING
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
Sen. Darren Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 112A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5392&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5392.htm |