IL HB5385 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the credit for student-assistance contributions sunsets on December 31, 2030 (currently, December 30, 2020). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-STUDENT ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5385&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5385.htm |