IL HB5380 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit to taxpayers that own and operate a small farm and make a qualifying food commodity donation to a food bank or emergency feeding organization. Provides that the credit shall be equal to the lesser of $5,000 or 15% of the value of the food commodity donated. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-SMALL FARMS
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5380&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5380.htm |