IL HB5360 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for taxpayers who employ individuals working within the engineering sector who graduated from an accredited institution of higher learning with a Bachelor's degree or higher. Provides that the credit shall be equal to 10% of the compensation paid for the first through fifth years of employment in the engineering sector if the qualified employee graduated from an institution located in Illinois or 5% of the compensation paid for the first through fifth years of employment in the engineering sector if the qualified employee graduated from an institution not located in Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-ENGINEERING STUDENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5360&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5360.htm |