IL HB5355 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Nonopioid Alternatives for Pain Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to develop and publish an educational pamphlet regarding the use of nonopioid alternatives for pain treatment. Provides that a health care practitioner shall exercise professional judgment in selecting appropriate treatment modalities for pain in accordance with specified Centers for Disease Control and Prevention guidelines, including the use of nonopioid alternatives whenever nonopioid alternatives exist. Requires a health care practitioner who prescribes an opioid drug to provide certain information to the patient, discuss certain topics, and document the reasons for the prescription. Requires the Department to develop a nonopioid directive form for patients. Sets forth provisions concerning exceptions, execution of a nonopioid directive, opioid administration to a patient with a nonopioid directive, and limitations of liability. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that when a licensed health care practitioner prescribes a nonopioid medication for the treatment of acute pain, it shall be unlawful for a health insurance issuer to deny coverage of the nonopioid prescription drug in favor of an opioid prescription drug or to require the patient to try an opioid prescription drug before providing coverage. Provides that in establishing and maintaining its drug formulary, a health insurance issuer shall ensure that no nonopioid drug approved by the Food and Drug Administration for the treatment or management of pain shall be disadvantaged or discouraged, with respect to coverage or cost sharing, relative to any opioid or narcotic drug for the treatment or management of pain. Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that whenever a licensed health care practitioner prescribes a nonopioid medication for the treatment of acute pain, neither the Department of Healthcare and Family Services nor a managed care organization shall deny coverage of the nonopioid prescription drug in favor of an opioid prescription drug or require a patient to try an opioid prescription drug prior to providing coverage of the nonopioid prescription drug. Makes other changes.
Title
NONOPIOID ALTERNATIVES ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-12-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-12-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-12-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-12-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-12-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-12-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-12-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-12-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-12-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-12-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-12-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-12-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-12-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2024-12-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-12-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-03-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 370c.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-55 | New Code | See Bill Text |