IL HB5353 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utility Act. Creates the Rural Illinois Utility Infrastructure Investment Program, under which the Illinois Commerce Commission shall make grants from the Rural Illinois Utility Infrastructure Investment Program Fund for qualified utility infrastructure projects. Amends the Gas Revenue Tax Act and the Electricity Excise Tax Law to provide that certain moneys collected under those Acts shall be deposited into the Fund. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Rural Illinois Utility Infrastructure Investment Program Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITY-RURAL INVESTMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220513-301.4New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text
356153Amended CodeCitation Text
356402-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback