IL HB5351 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning coverage for telehealth services, provides that if an individual or group policy of accident or health insurance provides coverage for telehealth services, it must provide coverage for licensed dietitians, nutritionists, and diabetes educators who counsel senior diabetes patients in the patients' homes to remove the hurdle of transportation for patients to receive treatment. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may authorize licensed dietitians, nutritionists, and diabetes educators to counsel senior diabetes patients in the patients' homes to remove the hurdle of transportation for patients to receive treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TELEHEALTH-DIABETES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1009
2018-08-21HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-21HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018
2018-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateDo Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.22Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback