IL HB5350 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to adopt a policy to (i) allow the parent or legal guardian of a child to notify the school principal or a designee in writing that the parent or legal guardian objects to the use of specific course material and (ii) allow the child to use alternative course material. Requires the alternative course material to be provided at the expense of the parent or legal guardian. Requires the content of the alternative course material to be sufficiently equivalent to the specific course material to enable the child to meet State standards in a particular subject area. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
SCH CD-OPT OUT/COURSE MATERIAL
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. David Welter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.77 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5350&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5350.htm |