IL HB5350 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Provisions and State Employees Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the alternative retirement annuity under the State Employees Article applies to a conservation police officer subject to the Tier 2 provisions. Provides that a conservation police officer subject to the Tier 2 provisions may convert up to 8 years of service credit established before the effective date of the amendatory Act as a conservation police officer under the State Employees Article into eligible creditable service by filing a written election with the Board under that Article, accompanied by a specified payment. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-SERS-CONSERVATION POLICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-160Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-110Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback