IL HB5350 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions and State Employees Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the alternative retirement annuity under the State Employees Article applies to a conservation police officer subject to the Tier 2 provisions. Provides that a conservation police officer subject to the Tier 2 provisions may convert up to 8 years of service credit established before the effective date of the amendatory Act as a conservation police officer under the State Employees Article into eligible creditable service by filing a written election with the Board under that Article, accompanied by a specified payment. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-SERS-CONSERVATION POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5350&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5350.htm |