IL HB5349 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Courses of Study Article of the School Code. Provides that if the parent or guardian of a student wants the student to receive comprehensive personal health and safety and comprehensive sexual health education, the student's parent or guardian must opt the student in to receive that education (rather than allowing a student's parent or guardian to opt the student out of comprehensive personal health and safety and comprehensive sexual health education). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SEX ED/PARENTAL OPT-IN
Sponsors
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. David Welter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-007-000 |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-9.1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5349&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5349.htm |