IL HB5349 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue, with the assistance of the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, shall examine the investment credit and the research and development credit to determine the impact that each of these credits has on the creation and retention of jobs, and report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019. Provides that the Department of Revenue, with the assistance of the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, shall examine each credit against a tax imposed under the Illinois Income Tax Act on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act to determine the impact that each credit has on the creation and retention of jobs, including, but not limited to, any stated job creation goals, and report its findings for each credit to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before 3 years after the effective date of the credit in question, and on or before every 3 years thereafter. Effective immediately.
Title
IMPACT OF TAX CREDITS-REPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business Growth & Incentives Committee; 003-002-000 |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business Growth & Incentives Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business Growth & Incentives Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Business Growth & Incentives Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |