IL HB5347 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Early Intervention Services System Act. Requires the Department of Human Services and the Illinois State Board of Education to jointly develop and implement a State policy under which parents of children with disabilities who previously received early intervention services under the Act may choose the continuation of those services until such children reach the age of 5 or enter, or are eligible under State law to enter, kindergarten. Provides that implementation of the new policy shall be contingent on the Department (i) holding public hearings as provided under the Act and (ii) complying with all applicable federal requirements. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EARLY INTERVENTION SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325203.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback