IL HB5344 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Construction Apprenticeship Program Act. Provides that, as a condition of engaging in a construction business in this State, a contractor must document proof of participation in an apprenticeship program approved by and registered with the United States Department of Labor's Bureau of Apprenticeship and Training. Imposes a penalty not to exceed $5,000 for a first violation and a penalty not to exceed $10,000 for subsequent violations. Provides for enforcement by the Department of Labor and authorizes the adoption of any rules necessary to implement the Act.
Title
CONSTRUCTION APPRENTICESHIP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5344&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5344.htm |