IL HB5344 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs shall establish a field office in each Legislative District (rather than such field offices as it shall find necessary to enable it to perform its duties).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS' AFFAIRS-FIELD OFFICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 31, 2018
2018-05-30SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-046-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-23HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-24HouseMotion Prevailed
2018-04-24HouseMotion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2028053Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback