IL HB5342 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. John G. Mulroe
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Authorizes a person to participate in the Chicago Firefighter Article if he or she (1) is or was employed and receiving a salary as a fireman, (2) has at least 5 years of service under the Chicago Firefighter Article, (3) is employed in a position covered under a specified provision of the Chicago Municipal Article relating to aldermen and members of the city council, (4) made an election under the Chicago Municipal Article to not receive service credit or be a participant under that Article, and (5) made an election to participate under the Chicago Firefighter Article. Provides that for such a person, "salary" means the lesser of (i) the salary associated with the highest career service rank under the Chicago Firefighter Article or (ii) the actual salary received by that person for service under a specified provision of the Chicago Municipal Article relating to aldermen and members of the city council. Provides that for the purposes of determining employee and employer contributions, the employee and employer shall be responsible for any and all contributions otherwise required if the person was employed as a fireman. Makes conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CHI FIRE-ALDERMEN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 80 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-11-14SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 15, 2018
2018-11-14HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 080-027-000
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-08-17HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-000-000
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-017-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-003-000
2018-04-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
4056-106Amended CodeCitation Text
4056-109Amended CodeCitation Text
4056-111Amended CodeCitation Text
4056-230New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback