IL HB5341 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, the court shall not deny a sealing or expungement petition because the petitioner has not satisfied an outstanding financial obligation established, imposed, or originated by a court, law enforcement agency, or a municipal, State, county, or other unit of local government, including, but not limited to, any cost, assessment, fine, or fee. Makes changes to the definition of "terminate". Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM ID-FINANCIAL OBLIGATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0776 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-021-001 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-004-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-039-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-001-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-001-000 |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-03-02 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |