IL HB5341 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, the court shall not deny a sealing or expungement petition because the petitioner has not satisfied an outstanding financial obligation established, imposed, or originated by a court, law enforcement agency, or a municipal, State, county, or other unit of local government, including, but not limited to, any cost, assessment, fine, or fee. Makes changes to the definition of "terminate". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID-FINANCIAL OBLIGATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0776
2018-08-10HouseEffective Date August 10, 2018
2018-08-10HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 032-021-001
2018-05-29SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-29SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 006-004-000
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-039-000
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2018-05-24HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-001-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-001-000
2018-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-02HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5341&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5341.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5341eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5341enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0776.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5341ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5341ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5341ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5341ham004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5341_05242018_036000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5341_05302018_010000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback