IL HB5340 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the License to Work Act. Deletes language providing that all notices sent to a person involved in administrative adjudications, hearings, and final orders shall state that failure to satisfy any fine or penalty shall result in the Secretary of State suspending his or her driving privileges, vehicle registration, or both. Deletes language providing that the Secretary is authorized to cancel a license or permit for failure to pay any fines, civil penalties owed to the Illinois Commerce Commission, or taxes or being a convicted sex offender. Provides that a person whose driver's license was cancelled due to a sex offense conviction shall have his or her driver's license reinstated. Deletes language providing that the reporting requirements for public officials to the Secretary shall apply to a truant minor in need of supervision, an addicted minor, or a delinquent minor whose driver's license has been suspended. Deletes language providing that the Secretary is authorized to suspend or revoke the driving privileges of a person without preliminary hearing for specific adjudications or violations. Provides that the Secretary is authorized to suspend or revoke the driving privileges of a person for specific violations. Provides that a person whose driver's license was suspended or revoked under certain circumstances shall have his or her driving privileges reinstated. Deletes language providing that the owner of a registered vehicle that has failed to pay any fine or penalty due and owing as a result of 10 or more violations shall have his or her driving privileges suspended. Repeals provisions providing the suspension of a driver's license of a person convicted of theft of motor fuel and suspension of driving privileges for failure to satisfy fines or penalties for toll violations or evasions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-LICENSE-SUSPENSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e).
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-06HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208.3Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-704.2Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-201Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-204Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
62556-206Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-209.1New CodeSee Bill Text
62556-213New CodeSee Bill Text
62556-306.5Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-306.7Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback