IL HB5340 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1452
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1452
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With respect to criminal history records checks of applicants for employment with a school district, includes other school districts and a local law enforcement agency as entities to which any information concerning the record of convictions obtained by the president of the school board or the regional superintendent of schools may be transmitted.
Title
SCH CD-BACKGROUND CHECKS-SHARE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-20 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1452 | |
2010-08-20 | Effective Date August 20, 2010 | |
2010-08-20 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2010-05-26 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000 | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-05-04 | Arrived in House | |
2010-05-04 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes | |
2010-05-04 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass Education; 006-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Education | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-24 | First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 019-000-001 | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-03-03 | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |