IL HB5334 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Employee Background Fairness Act. Provides that an employer may not refuse to hire an individual and may not discharge an individual because of the individual's criminal history unless the individual has one or more convictions and there is a direct relationship between one of more of an individual's convictions and the specific employment sought. Prohibits retaliation for exercising rights under the Act. Provides that an individual denied or discharged from employment because of his or her criminal history in violation of the Act may recover from the employer in a civil action: (1) damages in the amount of $2,000 or actual damages, whichever is greater; (2) costs and such reasonable attorney fees as may be allowed by the Court; and (3) any other relief as may be appropriate, including punitive damages. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BACKGROUND FAIRNESS ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-28HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback