IL HB5332 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Healthy Food Program Development Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture may coordinate with the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to establish a Healthy Food Development Program to expand access to healthy foods in eligible areas in the State by providing assistance to grocery stores, corner stores, farmers markets, and other small food retailers. Provides that the benefits provided shall be awarded to grocery stores, corner stores, farmers markets, and other small food retailers in eligible areas on a competitive basis, with priority given to projects with the greatest potential impact on expanding access to healthy foods ineligible areas that are underserved by retail sales of healthy food in the State. Provides requirements for participation in the program. Provides that the Department shall designate a grocery ambassador to assist retailers of healthy foods in this State by: (1) providing research and data on eligible areas with insufficient grocery access; (2) coordinating with the Department and the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity and other relevant State agencies; (3) providing assistance to small grocery retailers in this State, including obtaining and expediting regulatory procedures; and (4) providing other assistance as needed. Provides that the Department, in coordination with the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, shall convene a working group to develop a plan for establishing a commercial distribution system, for fresh produce and healthy foods to corner stores and other small food retailers.
Title
HEALTHY FOOD ACCESS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5332&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5332.htm |