IL HB5311 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Receivership Act. Creates a process in which a person is appointed by the court as the court's agent under the court's direction to take possession of, manage and, if authorized by the Act or court order, transfer, sell, lease, or otherwise dispose of receivership property. Requires the court to provide notice and opportunity for a hearing as appropriate before the court can issue an order under the Act. Applies to real property and any personal property related to or used in operating the real property and personal property and fixtures. Exempts an interest in real property improved by one to four dwelling units with some exceptions. Provides that the Act does not apply to a receiver appointed under the Illinois Mortgage Foreclosure Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS RECEIVERSHIP ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-04-05HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2024-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2024-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback