IL HB5311 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that 45 days prior to the scheduled discharge of a person committed to the custody of the Department of Corrections, the Department shall give the person: (1) information about obtaining a standard Illinois Identification Card or a limited-term Illinois Identification Card; (2) information about voter registration and may distribute information prepared by the State Board of Elections and may enter into an interagency contract with the State Board of Elections to participate in the automatic voter registration program and be a designated automatic voter registration agency under the Election Code; (3) information about job listings upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; (4) information about available housing upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; (5) a directory of elected State officials and of officials elected in the county and municipality, if any, in which the committed person intends to reside upon discharge from the correctional institution or facility; and (6) any other information that the Department of Corrections deems necessary to provide the committed person in order for the committed person to reenter the community and avoid recidivism (currently, the committed person is provided information, if uninsured, about applying for health care coverage including medical assistance under the Illinois Public Aid Code).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-RELEASEE-REENTRY INFO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-14-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback