IL HB5309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Agency and Grantee Bonus Prohibition Act. Provides that no State agency may pay a bonus to its employees. Provides that no entity receiving State grant funds may pay a bonus from grant funds awarded for operational expenses to its employees. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE AGENCY BONUS PROHIBITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-17 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Compensation and Benefits |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-045-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 004-002-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |