IL HB5296 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Extends the authorization for advance deposit wagering until December 31, 2021 (from December 31, 2018). Amends the Video Gaming Act. Allows for video gaming by licensed horse racing establishments (facilities operated by an organization licensee whose handle from wagering on Illinois races for 2016 was less than $32,000,000 or by an inter-track wagering location licensee that derives its license from such an organization licensee); makes conforming changes throughout the Video Gaming Act and in the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a licensed horse racing establishment that is an organization licensee may operate up to 150 video gaming terminals at its organization licensee location at any time and a licensed horse racing establishment that is an inter-track wagering location licensee may operate up to 5 video gaming terminals at the inter-track wagering location licensee's location or on the premises of the organization licensee with which it is affiliated. The provisions amending the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 are effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIDEO GAMING AT TRACKS/ADW

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseRemains in Executive Committee
2018-05-24HouseReported Back To Executive Committee;
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Executive Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-17HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-17HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2304025Amended CodeCitation Text
2304030Amended CodeCitation Text
2304035Amended CodeCitation Text
2304045Amended CodeCitation Text
230405Amended CodeCitation Text
2304055Amended CodeCitation Text
2304058Amended CodeCitation Text
2304060Amended CodeCitation Text
230526Amended CodeCitation Text
230526.8Amended CodeCitation Text
230526.9Amended CodeCitation Text
230527Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback