IL HB5295 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a policeman receives any compensation as temporary total disability, permanent total disability, a lump sum settlement award, or other payment under the Workers' Compensation Act or the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act for any injury resulting in disability, any disability benefit provided to the policeman for such disability under the Article shall be reduced by any compensation amount so received, if that compensation amount is less than the amount of the disability benefit. Provides that if the amount received as compensation exceeds the amount of the disability benefit, the policeman shall not receive the disability benefit until the disability benefit payable equals the amount of such compensation received without consideration of interest. Provides that if the widow, child or children, or parent or parents of a policeman, or any of these persons, receives any compensation under the Workers' Compensation Act or the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act for any injury resulting in the policeman's death, the annuities provided for those beneficiaries shall be reduced by any compensation amount so received, if that compensation amount is less than the amount of the annuities. Provides that in computing a policeman's service, periods during which the policeman received compensation under the Workers' Compensation Act or the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act shall be counted. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI POLICE-DISABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0806 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-000-001 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 5-157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 5-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |