IL HB5294 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that licensed medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities (MC/DD) (rather than licensed long-term care facilities for persons under 22 years of age) that serve severely and chronically ill patients (rather than pediatric patients) shall have a specific reimbursement system designed to recognize the characteristics and needs of the patients they serve. Sets forth certain reimbursement rates for MC/DD facilities for date of services starting July 1, 2018. Requires MC/DD facilities to document within each resident's medical record the conditions or services using the minimum data set documentation standards and requirements to qualify for exceptional care reimbursement. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall be responsible for reimbursement calculations and direct payment for services. Imposes an assessment and licensing fee on MC/DD facilities. Creates the Medically Complex for the Developmentally Disabled Provider Fund for the purpose of receiving and disbursing assessment moneys, including making payments to intermediate care facilities for persons with a developmental disability that are also licensed as MC/DD facilities and making payments of any amounts which are reimbursable to the federal government. Makes other changes. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Medically Complex for the Developmentally Disabled Provider Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-MC/DD FACILITIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-5.4hAmended CodeCitation Text
30555C-1Amended CodeCitation Text
30555C-11New CodeSee Bill Text
30555C-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback