IL HB5293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Endangered Species Protection Act. Provides that a permit for incidental taking under the Act shall not be required if a federal conservation agreement, including but not limited to, a candidate conservation agreement, habit conservation plan, or safe harbor agreement, is in effect and approved by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service under the federal Endangered Species Act of 1973. Provides that in making Endangered Species Protection Board appointments of naturalists, the Governor shall give consideration to recommendations of conservation groups. Provides that of the remaining appointed members, 2 members shall be landowners representing the State's largest general farm organization. Removes the exemption for notice or public hearing when the Endangered Species Protection Board automatically places a species or subspecies of an animal or plant on the Illinois endangered list after designation as endangered by the U.S. Secretary of Interior. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-ENDANGERED SPECIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-002
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
520105.5Amended CodeCitation Text
520105.6New CodeSee Bill Text
520106Amended CodeCitation Text
520107Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback