IL HB5293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Endangered Species Protection Act. Provides that a permit for incidental taking under the Act shall not be required if a federal conservation agreement, including, but not limited to, a candidate conservation agreement, conservation plan, or safe harbor agreement, is in effect and approved by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service under the federal Endangered Species Act of 1973. Provides that in making Endangered Species Protection Board appointments of naturalists, the Governor shall give consideration to recommendations of conservation groups. Provides that of the remaining appointed members, 2 members shall be landowners representing the State's largest general farm organization. Removes the exemption for notice or public hearing when the Endangered Species Protection Board automatically places a species or subspecies of an animal or plant on the Illinois endangered list after designation as endangered by the U.S. Secretary of Interior. Effective immediately.
Title
WILDLIFE-ENDANGERED SPECIES
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-002 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 10 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 10 | 5.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |