IL HB5290 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that a home rule municipality may file a petition to disconnect fire protection district territory from the district if: the municipality's fire department services at least 80% of the municipality; the disconnection will not cause the territory of the district to be noncontiguous; and the loss of assessed valuation by reason of the disconnection of the territory will not impair the ability of the district to render adequate fire protection service to the territory remaining in the district. Provides that territory disconnected shall remain liable for its proportionate share of any bonded indebtedness outstanding as of the date of disconnection. Provides for petition, hearing, notice, and objection requirements. Further provides that if a court finds that the petition complies with the Section and that the allegations of the petition are true, the court shall order that the territory be disconnected.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRE PROTECT DIST-DISCONNECT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-14HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseTo Fire Service Subcommittee
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Fire Service Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7070515cNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback