IL HB5289 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires school districts to provide contact information for the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline and for the Crisis Text Line on the back of each student identification card issued by the school district. Provides that if the school district does not issue student identification cards to its students or to all of its students, the school district must publish this information on its website. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-STUDENT ID INFO-SUICIDE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5289&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5289.htm |